Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 4161 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17567 Week
» 70583 Month
» 190110 Year
» 3216963 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6943 |
17/09/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37243 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37697 |
1986 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3500/D931 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
17/09/1964 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Withdrawn |
01/04/1999 |
Time in Service |
34 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys |
Cut Up |
03/2006 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
17/09/1964 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1968 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1974 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) isolated |
|
|
|
|
21/12/1974 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Boiler water tank converted to fuel tank |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1979 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/09/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1974 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
21/12/1974 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1979 |
vbt |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
|
jX |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/09/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6943 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3500 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
01/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
17/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37243 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) isolated |
|
|
21/12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler water tank converted to fuel tank |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37697 |
|
|
01/04/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37697 |
|
|
03/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|