Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 958 Today
» 5975 Yesterday
» 6933 Week
» 105578 Month
» 308242 Year
» 3335095 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6946 |
08/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37246 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37698 |
1986 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
08/10/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
01/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
27/02/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
04/12/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/10/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
01/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
04/12/1974 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6946 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3503 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
01/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37246 |
|
|
04/12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
30/11/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37698 |
|
|