Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 498 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5099 Week
» 16646 Month
» 416328 Year
» 492915 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6948 30/10/1964
TOPS (37/0) 37248 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 37
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 30/10/1964
Withdrawn 01/02/2009
Time in Service 44 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
86A Cardiff Canton (New) 30/10/1964
91N To North Eastern Region 4w/e 31/08/1967
56B Healey Mills 4w/e 09/09/1967
86A Cardiff Canton w/e 08/01/1972
   Withdrawn 01/02/2009

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/10/1964 To Service To service as D6948
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)
   
31/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N)    
09/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B)    
12/1971 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Fitted    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 37248    
21/12/1974 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Removed    
01/02/2009 Withdrawn Condemned as 37248    

prev prev