Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4362 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17768 Week
» 70784 Month
» 190311 Year
» 3217164 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6949 |
09/12/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37249 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/9M) |
37903 |
04/02/1987 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
09/12/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
31/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
20/12/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/12/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
31/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
20/12/1974 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/12/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6949 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3506 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
31/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37249 |
|
|
20/12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
18/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
04/02/1987 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37903 |
|
|
01/12/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37903 |
|
|
10/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Crewe DMD |
|
|