Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 816 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18619 Week
» 71635 Month
» 191162 Year
» 3218015 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6952 |
07/01/1965 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37252 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
07/01/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
15/08/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 09/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/01/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
15/08/1974 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6952 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3509 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
16/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
28/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37252 |
|
|
15/08/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
24/03/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37252 |
|
|
07/2002 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Doncaster Carr MPD |
|
|