Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 429 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2875 Week
» 14580 Month
» 346069 Year
» 422656 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6960   06/03/1944

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1947 RAVENINGHAM HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hawksworth
Class Modified Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sun 06/03/1944
Withdrawal During 06/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 2 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 03/10/1953
81F Oxford 5w/e 31/08/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 81F Oxford 5w/e 31/08/1963
WDN   2w/e 08/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as GWR Number 6960, name: RAVENINGHAM HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6960    

prev prev