Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1405 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19208 Week
» 72224 Month
» 191751 Year
» 3218604 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6961 |
21/01/1965 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37261 |
29/11/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3521/D950 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
21/01/1965 to Tinsley (41A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
21/01/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/09/1967 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/01/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
01/09/1967 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6961 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3521 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
24/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
01/09/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
29/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37261 |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|