Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 692 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14735 Week
» 79689 Month
» 282353 Year
» 3309206 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6964 |
29/01/1965 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37264 |
05/01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3524/D953 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
29/01/1965 to Tinsley (41A) |
Withdrawn |
01/12/1999 |
Time in Service |
34 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
29/01/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1967 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/01/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
09/1967 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 03/1978 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
31/12/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6964 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3524 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
24/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
09/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
13/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
05/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37264 |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
01/12/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37264 |
|
|