Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1814 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19617 Week
» 72633 Month
» 192160 Year
» 3219013 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6965 |
03/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37265 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/4) |
37430 |
25/03/1986 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 37 | 03/02/1965 | 37/4 | 25/03/1986 |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3525/D954 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
03/02/1965 to Tinsley (41A) |
Withdrawn |
01/03/2000 |
Time in Service |
35 yrs , 27 dys |
Cut Up |
05/2008 |
Cut At |
EMR (Kingsbury) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
03/02/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
29/11/1967 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/02/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
29/11/1967 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6965 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3525 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
30/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
29/11/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
13/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37265 |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
25/03/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37430 |
|
|
01/03/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37430 |
|
|
05/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|