Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1079 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18882 Week
» 71898 Month
» 191425 Year
» 3218278 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6969 |
26/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37269 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/4) |
37417 |
14/11/1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 37 | 26/02/1965 | 37/4 | 14/11/1985 |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3529/D958 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
26/02/1965 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
26/02/1965 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 02/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
25/01/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
25/01/1969 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
25/01/1969 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/02/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
25/01/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS/ATC |
|
|
11/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6969 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3529 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
28/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
02/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37269 |
|
|
11/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
14/11/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37417 |
|
|