Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 167 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4335 Week
» 19449 Month
» 322639 Year
» 1544204 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6970 on 29/09/1944

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/1947 WHADDON HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class Modified Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 350
To Service Mon 29/09/1944
Withdrawal Mon 15/06/1964
Scrapping During 11/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 29/09/1944
PDN Old Oak Common 4w/e 30/10/1948
   Withdrawn on 15/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PDN Old Oak Common 4w/e 30/10/1948
WDN   w/e 15/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering works during April included:- 2095, 2159, 2407, 2612, 2655, 2702, 2784, 2787, 2808, 2835, 2936, 2937, 2940, 2949, 2954, 2989, 3012, 3018, 3048, 3150, 3386, 3586, 3594, 4007, 4020, 4023, 4042, 4078, 4381, 4920, 4968, 4971, 5012, 5043, 5305, 5375, 5960, 5986, 6023, 6309, 6344, 6399, 6953, 6970, and L.M.S. 8465. Further 'Panniers' fitted with T.F. boilers are 3663, 8713, and 8794. Works' pilots during April included: 200, 207, 1542, 1795, 1796, 2723, 2773 and 3561. New engines reported are: 1029 PDN, 9404 PDN. SLS/194706
30/09/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during September included: Nos. 1000/25, 1430/40/61, 1957/91, 2144/81/88/94, 2224/46/71, 2827/38/42/72/77/82, 2948, 3617, 3861/64/66, 3904/55, 4000/37/44/58/88, 4128, 4280, 4407, 4509/32/37/40/50, 4639, 4704, 4804, 4973/75/78, 5011/57/71/79, 5153/56, 5207, 5369/75, 5510/54/74, 5718/33/61, 5903/34/51/62/69/84, 6005/06/12, 6133, 6337/40/75/93, 6406/30, 6801/47, 6905/16/52/70, 7004/05/17, 7306/09, 7402/22, 7800/18, 8722/37/39, 9612, 9730.
New work; September: Nos. 7435 (-), 7436 (OXF), 7437 (WOS), 7438 (DG) (completed 5/10); 4160 (-). 4161 (BRY), 4162 (-), 4163 (BRY) and 4164 (DYD), nearly completed. Works' pilots have been Nos. 212, 1713, 1900 an 2764.
Outside the Works and awaiting scrapping are the following:-Nos. 1730, 2643/80, 2734/46/51, 3002/06/27, 3165/84, 3440, 5127, 5343/49 an 9006. In addition, Nos. 2709, 2928, 3005 an 3395 came in for scrapping at the beginning of October. All locomotives receiving a general repair (except express passenger locomotives) are now coming out painted plain black with the exception of No. 5156, which was fully lined, but without 'British Railways' on the tank sides. The majority of locomotives are now receiving smokebox number-plates.
No. 7017 was ex. Works on 22/9 after light repairs and is now running without nameplates
SLS/194811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/09/1944 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6970
Built at Swindon Works
   
05/1947 Naming Named 'WHADDON HALL'    
30/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
15/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6970    

prev prev