Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 551 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18354 Week
» 71370 Month
» 190897 Year
» 3217750 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6976 |
15/04/1965 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37276 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/4) |
37413 |
04/10/1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 37 | 15/04/1965 | 37/4 | 04/10/1985 |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3536/D965 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
15/04/1965 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Withdrawn |
01/12/2000 |
Time in Service |
35 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
15/04/1965 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
86A |
|
Cardiff Canton (New) |
on |
15/04/1965 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/12/2000 |
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
25/01/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
25/01/1969 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
25/01/1969 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1974 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) isolated |
|
|
|
|
21/12/1974 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Boiler water tank converted to fuel tank |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1979 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/04/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
25/01/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS/ATC |
|
|
12/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS (WR ATC isolated) |
|
|
21/12/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS (WR ATC isolated) |
|
|
by 03/1979 |
xbt |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
Dual AWS (WR ATC isolated) |
jX |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/04/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6976 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3536 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37276 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) isolated |
|
|
21/12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler water tank converted to fuel tank |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
04/10/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37413 |
|
|
01/12/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37413 |
|
|