Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 777 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4394 Week
» 16099 Month
» 347588 Year
» 424175 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6979 03/05/1965
TOPS (37/0) 37279 01/01/1973
TOPS (37/4) 37424 1985

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 37
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 03/05/1965
Withdrawn 01/03/2000
Time in Service 34 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
86A Cardiff Canton (New) 03/05/1965
   Withdrawn 01/03/2000

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/05/1965 To Service To service as D6979
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)
   
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 37279    
21/12/1974 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Removed    
1985 Renumbered Renumbered to 37424    
01/03/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 37424    

prev prev