Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 326 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4064 Week
» 1577 Month
» 229461 Year
» 1451026 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6981 on 30/01/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
02/1948 MARBURY HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class Modified Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 366
To Service Sat 30/01/1948
Withdrawal During 03/1964
Scrapping During 07/1964
Service Life 16 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 30/01/1948
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 10/09/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW SPM St Philips Marsh m/e 29/02/1948
1STALLOC SPM St Philips Marsh m/e 29/02/1948
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 04/12/1954
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 10/09/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/11/1961 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) 'A' Shop: D603, D825/32/56, D1000-12, D2175-7, D2383/4, D3032, D6320, 1010/15/24, 2832, 4003/82/92/5, 4706, 4903/18/32/76/89, 5073/8/87/96/8, 5974/6, 6014/26/8, 6345, 6826/45, 6909/33/55/81, 7015/21/2/34, 7232, 7322 (being cut up), 7805, 7915, 9400, 13115, 13353/5/62, 15100, 73027, 82004/35, 92233/41/5. Works Sidings: L90, 8, 1006/23, 2215, 3838/9, 4075/83, 4207, 4945, 5071, 5950/98, 6019, 6309/29/38, 6820, 6915/64, 7002, 7901/17, 8787, 9705, 75005, 78008, 92212. Triangle: 1606/15, 4563/5, 5039, 5538, 6415, 6993, 7417, 7787, 8772, 9739. Dump: 1433, 5332, 6700, 8706, 9745/9. 'C' Shop: 6392, 7775 intact. Outside Stock Shed: 5815, 6357, 6900. Weigh House: 5938/55. Outside Weigh House: D831/53, D6303, D7010. Works Shunters: 5756/80, 7756, 8721/62. SLS/196201
11/01/1964 Worcester Works 1024 (82C), 2232 (85A), 6954 (82B), 6981 (82B), 9490 (85A), 44691 (2E), D2123 (85A). In store awaiting scrap: 3207, 5022, 5205, 6807, 6948, 7000/31, W20, W23 an W26. SLS/196402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/01/1948 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6981
Built at Swindon Works
   
02/1948 Naming Named 'MARBURY HALL'    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6981    

prev prev