Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1390 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14796 Week
» 67812 Month
» 187339 Year
» 3214192 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6982 |
on |
11/02/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
Modified Hall |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
366 |
To Service |
Mon 11/02/1948 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 10/08/1964 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
14/10/1962 |
Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works |
1628/60, 2841/62, 3217, 3608/58, 3709/15/51/60/78, 4147, 4910/51, 5070, 5245, 5602, 6141, 6644/63/79, 6816, 6982, 7209, 8498, 9411/53, 9608/10/5/40/82. Ex-Works on shed: 9404/15; ex-Works on Oxley MPD; 4697, 7739. 'Kings' at Stafford Road minus numbers and nameplates: 6001/2/7/12/4/5/7/22. |
SLS/196211 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/02/1948 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6982 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
30/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
08/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) |
|
|
10/08/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6982 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|