Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 849 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18652 Week
» 71668 Month
» 191195 Year
» 3218048 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6983 |
on |
13/02/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
Modified Hall |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
366 |
To Service |
Wed 13/02/1948 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 25/08/1965 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
13/02/1948 |
81E |
|
Didcot |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
81F |
|
Oxford |
4w/e |
11/07/1965 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/08/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
m/e |
29/02/1948 |
1STALLOC |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
m/e |
29/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
81E |
Didcot |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
81F |
Oxford |
4w/e |
11/07/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/08/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/02/1948 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6983 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Didcot (81E) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
25/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6983 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|