Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 773 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6378 Week
» 17925 Month
» 417607 Year
» 494194 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6984   25/02/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
02/1948 OWSDEN HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hawksworth
Class Modified Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Fri 25/02/1948
Withdrawal Fri 03/12/1965
Service Life 17 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
85A Worcester 4w/e 14/06/1958
87H Neyland 4w/e 09/03/1963
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 28/09/1963
88A Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 30/11/1963
87A Neath (Court Sart) 6w/e 12/10/1964
86E Severn Tunnel Junction w/e 08/11/1964
82E Bristol Barrow Road 2w/e 11/04/1965
   Withdrawn 03/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW ?   m/e 29/02/1948
1STALLOC HFD Hereford m/e 31/03/1948
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 87H Neyland 4w/e 09/03/1963
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 88A Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 30/11/1963
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 3w/e 02/11/1964
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 5w/e 12/04/1965
WDN   03/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/02/1948 To Service To service as GWR Number 6984
Built at Swindon Works
   
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Neyland (87H)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88A)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
11/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
03/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6984    

prev prev