Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1811 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19614 Week
» 72630 Month
» 192157 Year
» 3219010 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6985 |
27/05/1965 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37285 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (2)) |
37335 |
02/09/1994 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3545/D974 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
27/05/1965 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Withdrawn |
01/08/1994 |
Time in Service |
29 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys |
Cut Up |
05/2000 |
Cut At |
Raxstar (at Immingham MPD) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
27/05/1965 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1974 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) isolated |
|
|
|
|
21/12/1974 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Boiler water tank converted to fuel tank |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1979 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/05/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1974 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
21/12/1974 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1979 |
vbt |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
|
jX |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/05/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6985 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3545 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37285 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) isolated |
|
|
21/12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler water tank converted to fuel tank |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
01/08/1994 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37285 |
|
|
02/09/1994 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37335 |
|
|
05/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Raxstar: at Immingham MPD |
|
|