Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 595 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19506 Week
» 84460 Month
» 287124 Year
» 3313977 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6989 |
17/06/1965 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37289 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/4) |
37408 |
21/08/1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 37 | 17/06/1965 | 37/4 | 21/08/1985 |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3549/D978 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
17/06/1965 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Withdrawn |
01/08/2005 |
Time in Service |
40 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 01/2008 |
Cut At |
EMR (Kingsbury) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
17/06/1965 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/06/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
vbt |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/06/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6989 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3549 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37289 |
|
|
09/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
06/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
21/08/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37408 |
|
|
01/08/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37408 |
|
|
01/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|