Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 782 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5383 Week
» 16930 Month
» 416612 Year
» 493199 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6989   25/03/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/1948 WIGHWICK HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hawksworth
Class Modified Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sun 25/03/1948
Withdrawal During 06/1964
Service Life 16 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
85A Worcester 4w/e 24/03/1956
85C Hereford 4w/e 18/05/1957
85A Worcester 4w/e 08/08/1959
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 06/10/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW HFD Hereford m/e 31/03/1948
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 85C Hereford 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 08/08/1959
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   2w/e 08/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/03/1948 To Service To service as GWR Number 6989
Built at Swindon Works
   
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
08/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6989    

prev prev