Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 601 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6206 Week
» 17753 Month
» 417435 Year
» 494022 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6990   08/04/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/1948 WITHERSLACK HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hawksworth
Class Modified Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Fri 08/04/1948
Withdrawal Fri 03/12/1965
Service Life 17 yrs, 7 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81F Oxford 4w/e 31/12/1950
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 31/01/1952
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 02/11/1963
82E Bristol Barrow Road 7w/e 22/06/1964
   Withdrawn 03/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW BRD Bristol Bath Road m/e 30/04/1948
ALLOC PDN Old Oak Common m/e 31/05/1948
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 3w/e 29/06/1964
WDN   03/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/04/1948 To Service To service as GWR Number 6990
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
31/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
03/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6990    

prev prev