Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 540 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2655 Week
» 25161 Month
» 328351 Year
» 1549916 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6991 on 23/11/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
23/11/1948 ACTON BURNELL HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class Modified Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 368
To Service Fri 23/11/1948 to Westbury (WES)
Withdrawal Fri 31/12/1965
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 17 yrs, 1 mth , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
WES Westbury (New) on 23/11/1948
81C Southall 4w/e 09/10/1954
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 04/05/1963
81E Didcot 2w/e 10/01/1965
81F Oxford 4w/e 11/07/1965
   Withdrawn on 31/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/11/1948
1STALLOC WES Westbury m/e 31/12/1948
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 09/10/1954
TOSTORE   4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 04/05/1963
ALLOC 81E Didcot 5w/e 04/01/1965
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 11/07/1965
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1948 Swindon Works New Work November: Nos. 6761 DYD (3/11), 6762 (4/11), 6763 (10/11), 6764 (12/11), 6765 (26/11); 4169 (15/11); 6991 Acton Burnell Hall WES (22/11), 6992 Arborfield Hall (26/11); Nos. 4168 an 6760 PILL were both completed on 29/10. Locomotives entering Works 28/10/48 to 26/11/48: These included Nos. 184 (condemned), 1013/27, 1331, 1435, 1538 (condemned - at present being used as Works pilot), 1749 (condemned), *1867 (condemned), *2010, *2121, *2187, 2249, *2706, *2717 (both condemned), 2819/71/74/88/96, 2906/32/40/43/53, 3169/86, 3624/77, 3733, 3806/41/64, 3951, 4015/18/25/60/81/83/92/93, 4123, 4287, 4508/53/84, 4665/91, 4900/60, 5031/32/49/67, 5121 (condemned), 5128/77, 5345, 5406/11, 5537/44/48, 5689, 5744/72/81/94, 5801, 5926/67/89, 6021, 6146, 6382/88, 6407, 6715, 6835/43/52, 6915/35/40/47/50/59/61, 7760, 7808, 8751, **9019 (condemned), 9310, 9754, 'Austerity' 77380. *Open cab. **Fitted small 2,000 gallon tender (No. 1128 of 4/96). Nos. 6991/92 came out painted black and fully lined, While Nos. 4168/69, 6760/65 are black and unlined. The following have been painted black and fully lined:-Nos. 4966/96, 5967/92, 6922/40/50 while Nos. 1362, 2194, 2252, 2840, 3685/96, 3811, 4290, 5214, 5384, 5563, 7234, 7716/64, 8768/77, 9310 an 9711 are painted black, but not lined. Nos. 3720 an 7702 have 'G.W.R.' on the tank sides and are fitted with smokebox numberplates. No. 6009 has been fitted with a new standard cast iron smokebox num-berplate, in place of the former smaller brass one, all locomotives leaving Works are now fitted with smokebox numberplates. Locomotives noted with top feed boilers:-Nos. 3624/85/96, 5772/81, 5801, 7702/16/64, 8710/68/77, 9745. SLS/194901

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/11/1948 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6991, name: ACTON BURNELL HALL
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Westbury (WES)
   
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
04/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
10/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
31/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6991    

prev prev