Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 498 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5099 Week
» 16646 Month
» 416328 Year
» 492915 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6994 08/07/1965
TOPS (37/0) 37294 06/11/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 37
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 08/07/1965
Withdrawn 30/09/2008
Time in Service 43 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
86A Cardiff Canton (New) 08/07/1965
   Withdrawn 30/09/2008

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/07/1965 To Service To service as D6994
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)
   
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 37294    
30/09/2008 Withdrawn Condemned as 37294    

prev prev