Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 412 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 412 Week
» 22918 Month
» 326108 Year
» 1547673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6994 on 10/12/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/1948 BAGGRAVE HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class Modified Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 368
To Service Sat 10/12/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/11/1964
Scrapping During 02/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 15 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 10/12/1948
82D Westbury 4w/e 24/04/1954
83C Exeter 4w/e 04/11/1961
81C Southall 4w/e 24/02/1962
89A Shrewsbury w/e 30/03/1963
2B Oxley w/e 20/06/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 14/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW EXE Exeter m/e 31/12/1948
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 24/02/1962
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 2B Oxley 5w/e 11/07/1964
WDN   w/e 14/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/08/1963 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) Triangle: 1432, 6437, 5679, 8444/86/91/94/96, 8766, 9401/79/83, 9715, D3103. Yard: 1621, 3668, 3711, 3826, 4082, 4175, 4265/98, 5645, 5933, 6011/25/26, 6159, 6815/19/28/35, 6931/32/61/78, 7909, 8738, 9412/40. 'A' Shop: D1023-26 (New in various stages of construction), D603, D801/4/40/61/2, D1004/9/16/9/50/63, D6305, D7075, 3605, 3738, 3850, 4115/57/68, 5971, 6000/18, 6129/65, 6809/15/37/68, 6937/44/78/94, 7902/27, 8403, 9662, 92246, Birmingham Pullman, uW60096. Top end of 'A' Shop: 15100/1/3, D3509/94/95, D3195, D3600, and N.C.B. 0-6-2 T. 67 (ex T.V.R.). Dismantling Shed: 5644, 5945. Dump: 3795, 4074, 5101/92, 5201, 5912/31, 7;412, 8783/91, 9713. Weigh House: D604, D808, 3823. On shed ex-Works: 9607, 9666. In store on shed: 1019, 2250, 2890, 3780, 3842, 4079, 4631, 4909, 4948, 5017, 5357, 5525/70, 5815, 5943, 9604 an W21. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/12/1948 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6994
Built at Swindon Works
   
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
30/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (2B)    
14/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6994    

prev prev