Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1840 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15246 Week
» 68262 Month
» 187789 Year
» 3214642 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6996 |
16/07/1965 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37296 |
01/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/4) |
37423 |
23/01/1986 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 37 | 16/07/1965 | 37/4 | 23/01/1986 |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3556/D985 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
16/07/1965 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
16/07/1965 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 04/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
14/02/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/07/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
01/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
14/02/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
xbt |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/07/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6996 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3556 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
14/02/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37296 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
06/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
22/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
23/01/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37423 |
|
|