Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2077 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19880 Week
» 72896 Month
» 192423 Year
» 3219276 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6997 |
21/07/1965 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37297 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/4) |
37420 |
09/12/1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 37 | 21/07/1965 | 37/4 | 09/12/1985 |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3557/D986 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
21/07/1965 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Withdrawn |
01/07/2000 |
Time in Service |
34 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys |
Cut Up |
02/2008 |
Cut At |
Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
21/07/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1969 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/07/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/07/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6997 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3557 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
06/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37297 |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
22/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
09/12/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37420 |
|
|
01/07/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37420 |
|
|
02/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|