Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 177 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 15789 Week
» 114434 Month
» 317098 Year
» 3343951 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6998 |
12/08/1965 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37298 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3558/D987 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
12/08/1965 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Withdrawn |
30/06/2005 |
Time in Service |
39 yrs, 10 mths , 18 dys |
Cut Up |
on 04/02/2006 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
12/08/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
26/04/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
26/04/1969 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
26/04/1969 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/08/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
26/04/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS/ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6998 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3558 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
26/04/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
26/04/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37298 |
|
|
02/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
30/06/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37298 |
|
|
04/02/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|