Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 74 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4931 Week
» 16636 Month
» 348125 Year
» 424712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6998   28/01/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/1949 BURTON AGNES HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hawksworth
Class Modified Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Tue 28/01/1949
Withdrawal During 12/1965
Service Life 16 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 22/03/1958
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 28/01/1961
81C Southall 7w/e 22/06/1964
81F Oxford 6w/e 19/09/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   28/01/1949
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 28/01/1961
ALLOC 81C Southall 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 81F Oxford 5w/e 19/09/1965
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/01/1949 To Service To service as GWR Number 6998
Built at Swindon Works
   
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
19/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6998    

prev prev