Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 223 Today
» 1220 Yesterday
» 223 Week
» 27697 Month
» 324711 Year
» 401298 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D7 28/11/1959
TOPS (Tops) 44007 27/02/1974

Names Carried
Name Date From
INGLEBOROUGH 28/11/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 44
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder Derby Works
To Service 28/11/1959
Withdrawn 30/11/1980
Time in Service 21 yrs , 2 dys
Cut Up 11/1981
Cut At Locomotive Works (Derby)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
1B Camden (New) 28/11/1959
17A Derby w/e 12/12/1959
1B Camden w/e 23/04/1960
18A Toton w/e 03/03/1962
D16 Nottingham Division 16/01/1965
   Withdrawn 30/11/1980


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/11/1959 To Service To service as D7, name: INGLEBOROUGH
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Camden (1B)
   
12/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
03/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
08/04/1962 Sightings Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. SLS 5/1962 Link
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
27/02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 44007    
30/11/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 44007    
11/1981 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    

prev prev