Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 780 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5381 Week
» 16928 Month
» 416610 Year
» 493197 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 70000   05/01/1951

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/01/1951 BRITANNIA

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Britannia
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 05/01/1951 to Stratford (30A)
Withdrawal Sat 28/05/1966
Service Life 15 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30A Stratford (New) 05/01/1951
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 31/01/1959
1A Willesden w/e 30/03/1963
5A Crewe North w/e 25/05/1963
5B Crewe South w/e 29/05/1965
9D Newton Heath w/e 05/03/1966
   Withdrawn 28/05/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 30A Stratford 05/01/1951
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 1A Willesden 30/03/1963
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 5w/e 12/06/1965
LOAN 9D Newton Heath 5w/e 12/03/1966
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 4w/e 09/04/1966
WDN   w/e 28/05/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/01/1951 To Service To service as BR Number 70000, name: BRITANNIA
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
02/12/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on Doncaster shed. SLS 1/1962 Link
30/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
29/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
05/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
28/05/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 70000    

prev