13/01/1962 |
Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shop) |
New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. |
SLS/196202 |
28/01/1962 |
Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) |
New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. |
SLS/196203 |
04/03/1963 |
GC line |
Since the withdrawal of the local services from 4th March, Annesley shed now works the remaining semi-fast services (Nottingham-London) using Class 5s and Royal Scots. Woodford shed now has no passenger workings and its stud of ex LMR 2-6-4Ts (from Neasden) have been placed in store. Leicester shed has not been closed but its allocation has been reduced; on 16th March the following were on shed-42437/53/6, 44690, 45238, 45579, 48079; 46112, 60961 an 61374. Only latter was in steam. Leicester Central will be used during the summer for the former Belgrave Road station trains to Mablethorpe and Skegness (which ran on Saturdays and Sundays only). |
SLS/196304 |
28/02/1963 |
March MPD |
Britannias 70000/1/2/3/5/6-13 were all placed in store at March in February due to further dieselisation by Type 3 diesels from Darnall and these now cover several March freight turns; three of the Britannias are understood to be unserviceable due to frost damage. On 30th March 70000/1/5/10/2 were transferred to Willesden leaving the others stored at the time. On 13th April, a visit to the shed revealed 70008/11/3 in steam acting as spare engines for diesel failures. J17 65541, which was stationary boiler here, has now been replaced by B1 61378. A new diesel depot is being built at March alongside the old repair shops and a further diesel depot is now under construction at Kings Lynn where 7 Brush and 6 small diesels are stationed. Several Brush diesels are now stabled in the old steam shed at Cambridge and 2 Brush diesels and one 204 h.p. stable at Ely. |
SLS/196304 |
16/04/1963 |
Malton MPD |
The closure of Malton shed, recently forecast, as being likely to take place this summer, actually occurred officially on and from 16th April. All Malton’s steam locos. had however left during the preceding week, and on the official day of closure, the only steam loco. at the shed was 43055 (50A), on temporary standby. The two diesel shunters are now stabled overnight on a carriage siding under that part of the station roof which covers the Whitby bay platform. Since closure of Malton shed, local goods workings between York and Malton have been covered by 2-6-Os of 43XXX and 77XXX series; one of the latter type (including 77004 still with snowplough) brings the early morning goods from York and continues with the pick-up freight to Whitby, where it is remanned. The diesel shunters have been working the thrice-weekly trip on the Gilling branch, which is now disconnected at the Pilmoor end. The Ampleforth College Special from London to Gilling on 30th April, was worked from KX to Malton by A4 60017 Silver Fox and was replaced by 2-6-0 77004 still fitted with its small snowplough. Y7 0-4-0 ex-L.N.E.R. 985 is lying derelict at Bentinck Colliery (nr. Kirkby in Ashfield) and appears to have been out of use for some time. |
SLS/196304 |