02/06/1951 |
Eastbourne Exhibition |
An exhibition of locomotives, open to the general public, was a big attraction on Saturday afternoon, 2nd June, The exhibits comprised electric loco. No. 20003, Class 7 No. 70009 Alfred the Great, Class 4 No. 75000, Class 5 No. 73001, Fell diesel No. 10100, diesel shunter No. 15227, representing the work of Ashford, Crewe, Swindon, Derby, Derby and Ashford respectively. |
SLS/195107 |
02/06/1951 |
Railway Exhibition At Eastbourne |
On the occasion of the opening of the Conference of the Internationa, Railway Union on 2/6 in Eastbourne, a very fine exhibition was staged in the goods yard there which was open to the public in brilliant sunshine during the afternoon. Locomotives displayed were: diesel-electric 0-6-0 shunter, No. 15227, built at Ashford; Fell diesel-mechanical 4-8-4, No. 10100; class 4 4-6-0 No. 75000, just completed at Swindon. carrying shedplate 82C; class 5 4-6-0 No. 73001, built at Derby in May; class 7 4-6-2 No. 70009 Alfred the Great, straight from trial express running on the Waterloo-Bournemouth service but normally shedded at Norwich; S.R. 'CC' electric locomotive No. 20003. All except No. 20003 were practically new engines. Many of us saw for the first time on that occasion the 'Fell' locomotive and the smaller standard 4-6-0 type of B.R. creation. All were clean, cold, and available for close inspection, with inspectors and other officials on hand to give information. There were also fine examples of the latest Festival rolling stock, including dining and kitchen cars, goods wagons and vans, semaphore and colour-light signals, bull-headed also flat-bottom track in complete lengths, as well as some small specimens of modern machinery. This was a red-letter day in East Sussex! Alfred the Great hauled the four new coaches down the previous day as a special; No. 75000 towed the D-M, which is a decidedly formidable-looking 'box of tricks.' |
SLS/195108 |
30/06/1951 |
Britannias & B. of B.\'s |
Apart from 70004/9/14 the E.R. Allocation of Class '7' Pacifics was completed during Date: w/e 30th June, 70005 having returned from Rugby and been observed working 'The Norfolkrnan' on 27th June. On the whole these engines have made the most of their opportunities of really showing their paces on the new services which commenced with the Summer Timetable on 2nd July. The new timings, the results of imaginative and enterprising timetable work provide, among many improvements, four trains running daily between Liverpool St. and Norwich in 130 minutes. The Southern Region light 'Pacifics' have appeared on most of the main line expresses since their arrival but their activities have been somewhat circumscribed by the absence of water scoops which, on the Norwich run entails an extended stop for water at Ipswich. Despite this, 34065 worked the 8.30 a.m. 'flyer' on 20th July. 34039 also made a rare appearance on the Up 'Hook Continental' on 30th July. |
SLS/195109 |
31/07/1951 |
Southern Notes |
Standard 2-6-4T, 80010, was working in July Brighton-Victoria via Oxted. New diesel-electric 0-6-0 shunting engines numbered 15228-31 have been completed at Ashford where the big express locomotive with that method of propulsion, No. 10202 was nearly ready for trials at the end of July. There having presumably been no decision in her favour, the Stirling 4-4-0, 1231, which though condemned had been standing at Ashford Works for two years or so in case of possible preservation, has now gone to the scrap yard. Classes 'F1' & 'B1' are now extinct. Some of the rebuilt Wainwright 4-4-0's of classes 'D1' & 'E1' are to receive new parts and general overhaul. Though not so much in use on Kent coast fast trains now, they do good work with excursions on that route, sometimes with 9 or 10 corridor coaches starting from suburban stations in summer, as well as hauling the Holborn or Green-wich route slow passenger trains or semi-fasts which are a late night or early morning feature on the Eastern Section. Some of Adams's 'G6' & 'O2' tanks are also receiving general repair. The last Stroudley 'D' tank (0-4-2) No. 2359 which had been performing stationary boiler service at Dover was at Ashford condemned on 24th July. Green painting of 'Merchant Navy' engines in the very dark shade used at Eastleigh has commenced. 'King Arthurs' are supplementing the heavy and light 'Pacifics' in handling the Continental boat traffic to and from Folkestone and Dover during the holiday season. 'L' class 4-4-0's work through between Charing Cross and New Romney on summer Saturdays, traversing a single line from Appledore and running tender first one way on the branch, with fast runs west of Ashford via Tonbridge or Maidstone East. The veteran 'Terrier' 0-6-0T, 32670, which is nearly 80 years old, ran as a light engine from Headcorn to Ashford, St. Leonards, and so in stages to Brighton Works. The diminutive side tanks were green but plain, the semi-circular lettering 'K&ESR No. 3' having been painted out when a B.R. number was provided. No. 1602, the solitary 'T' class London, Chatham and Dover small 0-6-OT also passed along the coast line from St. Leonards on a roundabout last journey from Reading to Brighton shops. Atlantic 32426 St. Albans Head looked smart in 'L&NW' livery at Hastings on a holiday special ex-Birmingham formed of L.M.S. stock, often also working Newhaven boat specials. After a spell at Nine Elms on Waterloo express trials (with 70009), class '7' 4-6-2, 70014, Iron Duke, was at Stewarts Lane at the beginning of August and working on Folkestone or Dover boat trains. Class '4' 2-6-4T, 42093, hauled the 11.34 a.m. Ramsgate-Victoria semi-fast on 28th July, this is the return working of the 5.10 a.m. down slow from London. 'N' class 'Moguls' hauled several Kent coast trains via Tonbridge on 4th August. On that day the main Birkenhead-Ramsgate train loaded to 13 corridors, including Diner, was headed east of Redhill by 30913, Christs Hospital; like Nos. 30907 an 30917, this 'Schools' is still green. |
SLS/195109 |
02/07/1961 |
Doncaster Works (Erecting Shops) |
New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. |
SLS/196108 |
16/07/1961 |
Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) |
New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. |
SLS/196109 |
04/03/1963 |
GC line |
Since the withdrawal of the local services from 4th March, Annesley shed now works the remaining semi-fast services (Nottingham-London) using Class 5s and Royal Scots. Woodford shed now has no passenger workings and its stud of ex LMR 2-6-4Ts (from Neasden) have been placed in store. Leicester shed has not been closed but its allocation has been reduced; on 16th March the following were on shed-42437/53/6, 44690, 45238, 45579, 48079; 46112, 60961 an 61374. Only latter was in steam. Leicester Central will be used during the summer for the former Belgrave Road station trains to Mablethorpe and Skegness (which ran on Saturdays and Sundays only). |
SLS/196304 |
28/02/1963 |
March MPD |
Britannias 70000/1/2/3/5/6-13 were all placed in store at March in February due to further dieselisation by Type 3 diesels from Darnall and these now cover several March freight turns; three of the Britannias are understood to be unserviceable due to frost damage. On 30th March 70000/1/5/10/2 were transferred to Willesden leaving the others stored at the time. On 13th April, a visit to the shed revealed 70008/11/3 in steam acting as spare engines for diesel failures. J17 65541, which was stationary boiler here, has now been replaced by B1 61378. A new diesel depot is being built at March alongside the old repair shops and a further diesel depot is now under construction at Kings Lynn where 7 Brush and 6 small diesels are stationed. Several Brush diesels are now stabled in the old steam shed at Cambridge and 2 Brush diesels and one 204 h.p. stable at Ely. |
SLS/196304 |
16/04/1963 |
Malton MPD |
The closure of Malton shed, recently forecast, as being likely to take place this summer, actually occurred officially on and from 16th April. All Malton’s steam locos. had however left during the preceding week, and on the official day of closure, the only steam loco. at the shed was 43055 (50A), on temporary standby. The two diesel shunters are now stabled overnight on a carriage siding under that part of the station roof which covers the Whitby bay platform. Since closure of Malton shed, local goods workings between York and Malton have been covered by 2-6-Os of 43XXX and 77XXX series; one of the latter type (including 77004 still with snowplough) brings the early morning goods from York and continues with the pick-up freight to Whitby, where it is remanned. The diesel shunters have been working the thrice-weekly trip on the Gilling branch, which is now disconnected at the Pilmoor end. The Ampleforth College Special from London to Gilling on 30th April, was worked from KX to Malton by A4 60017 Silver Fox and was replaced by 2-6-0 77004 still fitted with its small snowplough. Y7 0-4-0 ex-L.N.E.R. 985 is lying derelict at Bentinck Colliery (nr. Kirkby in Ashfield) and appears to have been out of use for some time. |
SLS/196304 |
12/08/1964 |
Crewe Works (Works Yard) |
Arrival Sidings: 41264, 42233/581/651, 44836/8/934, 45005/38/249, 46487, 48050/205/301/556/617, 78023, 84028. Paint Shop: D1589, D1611/2/3/5/6, 26057, 27006, L.M.S. 6233 Duchess of Sutherland (painted in L.M.S. livery for Butlin's Camp, Ayrshire), 49395, Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D230/41/82, D302/22, D1610, D6826/36, 48641. Paint Shop Yard: 42210/152, 48158/62/462, 78010, 92203. Diesel Test Road: D207, D1614, D8053. Erecting Shop: New Construction D1619-D1636 in various stages of construction, D203/74/6/9/83, D304/6/29/33/84/6, D5719, D6843, D8009/13/17/55, 42134/577/611, 44695/946, 45003/338, 45558, 48104/36/215/18/87/305/531/710/67, 92001/59/166/77, 92205/12. No. 9 Shop: D1617/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 48010/193/466, 84026, 92042. Works Yard: D217/8/89/91, D350, D5706/16, D6758, D8045, 42115/697, 44593/937, 45297/325, 48002/153/267/426/548/53/676, 70001/9/36/51, 78044. Electric Traction Shop: E3021, 26033/52, D288, D315/24. Scrap Road: 48069/155/203/310/657/745, 84021/2. Dismantling Shed: 42090/614/86, 48335/64/494/540, 84025, 92065. |
SLS/196409 |
20/09/1964 |
Crewe Works (Paint Shop Yard) |
Paint Shop: D1622 painted, D1623 undercoat, D1626 undercoat, D1627 undercoat, D6786, 26049. Arrival Sidings: 42233, 42267, 42651, 42665, 44667, 45031, 45038, 45249, 48050, 48056, 48153, 48205, 48206, 48252, 48267, 48301, 48365, 48558, 48617, 78023, 92157. Works Siding adjacent to Scrap Road: 48069, 48155, 48202, 48310, 48657. Scrap Road: 42092, 48341, 84023. Traction Shop: D338, D371, E3012, 26025, 27004, 27005. Traction Shop Yard: D203, D274, D304, D379, D1646, D1647, D1648, D1649, D1650, D1651 shell, D8055. Erecting Shop Yard: D221, D232, D348, 42115, 48450, 70031. Minor Repair Road: 44688, 45195, 45455. Erecting Shop: D237, D244, D290, D301, D306, D329, D370, D380, D1624 undercoat, D1628 undercoat, D1629 undercoat, D1630 motors mounted, D1631 motors mounted, D1632 motors mounted, D1633, D1634, D1635, D1636, D1637, D1638, D1639, D1640, D1641, D1642, D1643, D1644, D1645 shell, D5706, D6768, D8017, D8056, 42436, 42546, 44664, 44779, 44814, 44835, 45005, 45327, 46487, 48057, 48218, 48247, 48335, 48351, 48356, 48357, 48364, 48435, 48540, 70022, 84015, 84025. Works Yard: 42186, 42421, 42608, 44663, 44715, 44803, 44857, 45103, 45307, 45392, 45716, 46491, 48002, 48024, 48081, 48160, 48334, 48552, 48721, 70033, 70034, 70053, 92024, 92100, 92139, 92206, 92223, 92231. Paint Shop Yard: D213, D276, D283, D354, D1621 painted, D333, D1625 undercoat, D6788, D8045, D8052, 42072, 45112, 45325, 48253, 48548, 48676, 70001, 70009, 70044, 78044. |
SLS/196410 |
21/03/1965 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: D1675-D1681, D1842-D1850, 44685/91, 44717/77, 45347, 45446, 45589, 48151/208/423/557, 70002/9/17/41, 77014, 78028, 92009/76, D5702/3, D8064, D204/20/8/55/68/91, D375/99, D1506/9/16/9/26, D1684/6; Traverser area: D258, D317/28/72, D1521/5/82, D1689, D1717, E27004, 48170/312/615, 92013; Waiting Works: D324, D1517/50, 44800, 44829, 44905, 45006/327, 48077/124/97/364/87/93/433/632/49/66, 70032, 92017; Electric shop: E26015/44, E3011/5/6/20/2/56; Paint shop: D1669/70/1/3/4, D8004/54, E3007, 71000 (Stored); Outside: 44807, 45303, 48470, 48646, 92107, 92133, 92205, D213, D1510/39/76, D8037/49. Also noted: D2708/11/22/41/2/3 an D1734 ex Salop accident. |
SLS/196505 |