Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 584 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6189 Week
» 17736 Month
» 417418 Year
» 494005 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 70013   30/05/1951

Names Carried
Date From Name
30/05/1951 OLIVER CROMWELL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Britannia
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 30/05/1951 to Norwich Thorpe (32A)
Withdrawal Sat 17/08/1968
Service Life 17 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
32A Norwich Thorpe (New) 30/05/1951
32B Ipswich 4w/e 11/10/1958
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 10/01/1959
31B March w/e 16/09/1961
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 07/12/1963
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 06/02/1965
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/12/1966
10A Carnforth w/e 06/01/1968
   Withdrawn 17/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 70A Nine Elms 12/05/1951
NEW 32A Norwich Thorpe 30/05/1951
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 24/01/1959
ALLOC 31B March 5w/e 07/10/1961
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region 25/11/1963
LOAN 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 3w/e 06/02/1965
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 31/12/1966
ALLOC 10A Carnforth w/e 06/01/1968
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 17/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Operational
Status Date 06/09/2011


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/05/1951 To Service To service as BR Number 70013, name: OLIVER CROMWELL
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)
   
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
07/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
06/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
17/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
06/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
06/04/1968 Sightings Worked a railtour in the North West, taking over southbound from D1110 at Hellifield. RCTS 6/1968  
17/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 70013    

prev prev