|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 20/02/1948 | 23/03/1948 | 33 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6691 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2436 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
96633 | |
Swindon Works | 30/03/1950 | 05/05/1950 | 37 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7604 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4044 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
184801 | |
Swindon Works | 21/01/1952 | 26/02/1952 | 37 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7602 (Diagram HC) |
280374 | |
Swindon Works | 14/12/1953 | 04/02/1954 | 53 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2399 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
377385 | |
Swindon Works | 19/09/1955 | 07/11/1955 | 50 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7640 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2793 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
458679 | |
Swindon Works | 05/11/1957 | 13/12/1957 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2670 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
561322 | |
Swindon Works | 21/09/1959 | 20/11/1959 | 61 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7632 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2728 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
638048 | |
Swindon Works | 15/05/1961 | 10/07/1961 | 57 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7667 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2841 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
727496 | |
Swindon Works | 20/10/1961 | 09/03/1962 | 141 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2564 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during February included:- Nos. 1013-15 1943, 1995, 2903, 2933, 2945, 2955, 3004, 3816, 3863, 4020, 4043, 4079, 4098, 4904, 4939, 4944, 4956, 5018, 5035, 5053, 5062, 5090, 5324, 5337, 5381, 5927, 5953, 5982, 6015, 6020, 6025, 6366, 6866, 6934, 6956, 7002, 7212, 7214, 7300, W.D. 77027, 77184, 79279, 79301 an 79309. Further locomotives ex works with prefix W and plain tanks or tenders included Nos. 823, 1433, 1441, 2288, 2951, while No. 6000 has the prefix and 'British Railways' on the tender | SLS/194804 |
28/05/1961 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | Gas Works: 4203, 5103/10/76, 9414. Stock Shed Yard: D817, D6319/21, 5815. Triangle: 1361/2/4, 1433, 1647, 3657/67/70/7, 3724, 5001, 6027, 6959, 8457, 8705, 9762. Works Yard: D804/38, D2144/88/91/6, D7000, 1029, 1501/2/9, 1604, 2516, 2884, 4090, 4950/72/8/85, 5022/97, 5949/58, 6004, 6937/62, 7007, 7221, 7304/40, 7761/75, 9400, 9749, 82031, 92226/45. Weigh House: D808, 4984. 'A' Shop: D602, D801/15/8/36/40/3/50/69/70, D1000-7, D2195/7-9, D2372-4, D3257, D6305/9, 3817, 4088, 4264/75, 4704, 4912/4/42/70/88/94, 5015/51/70/2/99, 5914/48/51/3/70/87, 6020, 6333/72, 6828/44/50, 6911/69/77/9, 7002/9/32/6, 7232/3, 13187, 13256/62, 15100/2, 82020/1, 92234. Dump: 1366, 1419/31/54/73, 2207/27, 3676, 5158/75/94, 5771/91, 6426, 7748, 8429, 8722/6/40/69/77, 9735/81. 'C' Shop: 5207, 8101. Field: 78001/8. | SLS/196107 |
12/11/1961 | Swindon Works (Works Sidings) | 'A' Shop: D603, D825/32/56, D1000-12, D2175-7, D2383/4, D3032, D6320, 1010/15/24, 2832, 4003/82/92/5, 4706, 4903/18/32/76/89, 5073/8/87/96/8, 5974/6, 6014/26/8, 6345, 6826/45, 6909/33/55/81, 7015/21/2/34, 7232, 7322 (being cut up), 7805, 7915, 9400, 13115, 13353/5/62, 15100, 73027, 82004/35, 92233/41/5. Works Sidings: L90, 8, 1006/23, 2215, 3838/9, 4075/83, 4207, 4945, 5071, 5950/98, 6019, 6309/29/38, 6820, 6915/64, 7002, 7901/17, 8787, 9705, 75005, 78008, 92212. Triangle: 1606/15, 4563/5, 5039, 5538, 6415, 6993, 7417, 7787, 8772, 9739. Dump: 1433, 5332, 6700, 8706, 9745/9. 'C' Shop: 6392, 7775 intact. Outside Stock Shed: 5815, 6357, 6900. Weigh House: 5938/55. Outside Weigh House: D831/53, D6303, D7010. Works Shunters: 5756/80, 7756, 8721/62. | SLS/196201 |
04/03/1962 | Swindon Works (Works Yard) | Triangle: 1435, 3636, 4123/6, 4929, 5167, 5509/11/49, 6152/3/66, 6348, 7421, 7796, 8441, 8700/79, 9738. Works Yard: D3437, 1009/21/7, 3809/49, 4093, 4632, 4905/44, 5924, 6006, 6408, 6820, 6965/7, 7002/4/27/37, 7306, 8489/94, 8721/33/62/75, 9460, 9765. Weigh House: 5967. 'C' Shop: 8735, 9416. Dump: 1642, 2205/6/30/88, 4207, 5069, 5770, 7771/2, 8451, 8768, 9454/74, 9720. 'A' Shop: D600/2/3, D808, D1002-17, D2182-6, D3035, D3354/6/60/6/97, D3425, D4009, D6315/23/37, 8, 1013/5/9/28, 2516, 2859/73/6, 3440, 4003, 4286, 4920/50, 5026/43/56, 5990/1, 6012, 6821/7/39, 6906/13/36/50/71/3/93, 7001/3/6/13/26, 7226, 7320/37, 7918, 9400, 82040, 92222/37. | SLS/196204 |
19/08/1962 | Wolverhampton Works (Awaiting works) | In Works: 1020, 1630, 3615, 3721, 4636, 4697, 4703, 5181/4, 5564, 6160, 6614/8, 7739, 7816, 8104, 9422/70, 9613/24/6/47/65, 82008; Weigh house: 6156; Awaiting works: 3217, 4938/61, 5065, 5658, 7002, 7824, 9415. | SLS/196209 |
15/12/1963 | Worcester Works | 1000, 2232, 4978, 6956, 7002, 41535. In store at shed: 3207, 5022, 7023/31. Great Bridge: (5930 and 7007 were removed to Great Bridge for scrap on 5th December). | SLS/196401 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/06/1946 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 7002, name: DEVIZES CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Landore (LDR) Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g Diagram HC boiler fitted |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Landore (LDR) | ||
20/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 20/02/1948. Dep: 23/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6691 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2436 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/1950 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4057 | ||
30/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 30/03/1950. Dep: 05/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7604 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4044 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
21/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 21/01/1952. Dep: 26/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7602 (Diagram HC) |
||
14/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/12/1953. Dep: 04/02/1954. Work undertaken: Tender number 2399 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
19/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 19/09/1955. Dep: 07/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7640 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2793 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) | ||
05/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/11/1957. Dep: 13/12/1957. Work undertaken: Tender number 2670 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (87E) | ||
21/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/09/1959. Dep: 20/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7632 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2728 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
26/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
15/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/05/1961. Dep: 10/07/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7667 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2841 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
20/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/10/1961. Dep: 09/03/1962. Work undertaken: Tender number 2564 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/03/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7002 from Worcester (85A) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |