Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 54 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17857 Week
» 70873 Month
» 190400 Year
» 3217253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7003 |
03/08/1961 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over green with light green skirting, white window surrounds |
03/08/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1971 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/08/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
11/1971 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/08/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7003 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7897 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
01/01/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7003 from Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
04/08/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|