31/12/1960 |
Immingham MPD |
70039/40 have been allocated to work passenger and fish trains through to London (more are expected); 70039 was first noted at 'Teterboro' on 19th Dec. when it had to come off a Kings X train with a broken steam heater pipe. 70040 was first noted working through Peterboro' on 27th December. The former Birmingham train now terminates at Nottingham. |
SLS/196102 |
19/03/1961 |
Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) |
New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. |
SLS/196105 |
02/07/1961 |
Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) |
New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. |
SLS/196108 |
16/07/1961 |
Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) |
New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. |
SLS/196109 |
15/11/1964 |
Crewe South MPD (Waiting Works) |
Ex-Works: 45392, 48458, 48721/45, 92231; Waiting Works: 42468, 42588, 42616, 44773, 45300, 45733, 47354, 47467, 46499, 48001, 48385, 48505, 48697, 48708, 70001/39, 80125, 92160; Stored: 43151, 45553, 45586; Also on shed: 5063, 6819/77, 7023, 7914. |
SLS/196412 |
27/06/1965 |
Crewe Works (Ex-Works: rks) |
Erecting shop: D1859/60/1, D1962-7, D202/11/32/4/95, D338/50/2, D1508/12/18/29/30/43/54/68, D5709/15, D8015/24, 44669/963, 45018/227/435/93, 48012/111/67/271/322/445/93/507/51/727, 70035/54, 92011/49/50/137/234. Electric shop: E3059/78/80/2/3, E26000. New Diesel shop: D222, D284, D290, D396, D1501/15/61, D1633. Paint shop: D1853/5-8, E3038/87, E26045, D8021, 71000 (stored outside). Traverser Area: 44679, 45327, 48116/768, D240, D1511/21, E3072. Side of Works: 44673/8/877/5004/190, 48474, 92021/212, 70023. Ex-Works: D248, D342, D1615/35/88, D6885, 44759, 45200, 45444/8, 48055, 70039, 92054/247. New diesel shop is the old 'cutting up' shop which has been converted into a light diesel repair shop. |
SLS/196508 |
11/09/1966 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 44658, 44680, 44807, 44839/64, 45134/449, 60007, 70039, 73069, 90318/65, 92234, E3004/35/9/45, D216/8/46, D328, D368, D370/4, D391, D1104-11, D1583/8, D1600/8/10/3/86, D1762/76, D1865; Electric Shop: E3018/38/44/54, 26055; Adjacent to Electric Shop: D204/37, D311, D1515/20/46, D1663/80, D1761, D1858/9/81, D1915, D5105, D5107/11, D5711/4, 27005; Test Area: D222/3/74, D336/43, D1501, D1688, D1727/69/96, D5246, D5717, D8049; Traverser Area: D217, D322, D1503, D1627/53/67/72, D1764, D1876, D1904, D8000/7, 26017, 70052, 71000. At side of Works: 45131/8, 70006/17, 90265/396, D1604, D1782, D1812, D5710. Paint Shop: D367, D1103, D5709, E3008, 44776, 44800, 60010, 26037. |
SLS/196610 |