|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/11/1961 | Crewe Works (Paint Shop Yard) | Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/07/1954 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 70048, name: THE TERRITORIAL ARMY 1908-1958 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Holyhead (6J) |
||
07/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
12/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
16/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) | ||
16/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (14D) | ||
23/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (16D) | ||
06/10/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
29/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) | ||
06/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (21D) | ||
10/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
07/11/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
17/12/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 70048 | ||
12/09/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |