Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 715 Today
» 1118 Yesterday
» 4351 Week
» 23996 Month
» 58638 Year
» 1280203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7005   25/06/1946

Names Carried
Date From Name
25/06/1946 LAMPHEY CASTLE
08/1957 SIR EDWARD ELGAR

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Mon 25/06/1946 to Worcester (WOS)
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964 off Southall (81C)
Scrapping During 01/1965 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 18 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 4017 25/06/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2569 25/08/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2720 08/10/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2907 23/04/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4048 29/01/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4053 26/04/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4006 20/12/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2563 26/07/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2862 20/11/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2730 23/06/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4108 18/03/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 4012 07/04/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2892 12/02/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2763 04/11/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4120 10/08/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2436 12/10/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2737 23/03/1963 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
WOS Worcester (New) 25/06/1946
81C Southall m/e 08/1964
   Withdrawn 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   07/09/1964
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
25/06/1946 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6697)
08/10/1948 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7622)
26/07/1951 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6696)
23/06/1953 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7619)
07/04/1955 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7616)
12/02/1957 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6698)
04/11/1958 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7622)
10/08/1960 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7637)
12/10/1962 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7604)

Reports
Report Date Report
06/1957 It is reported that in honour of the composer’s centenary this year "Castle" No. 7005—appropriately, a Worcester engine—is to be renamed Sir Edward Elgar.


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 01/09/1948 08/10/1948 38 days Intermediate
Boiler number 7622 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2720 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
108910
Swindon Works 14/03/1950 26/04/1950 44 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 4053 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
193050
Swindon Works 16/11/1950 20/12/1950 35 days Light Casual
Tender number 4006 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 12/06/1951 26/07/1951 45 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6696 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2563 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
238192
Swindon Works 08/05/1953 23/06/1953 47 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7619 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2730 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
357699
Swindon Works 10/02/1954 10/12/1954 304 days Light Casual
Tender number 4108 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 01/03/1955 07/04/1955 38 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7616 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4012 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
452319
Swindon Works 06/12/1956 12/02/1957 69 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6698 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2892 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
540612
Swindon Works 03/06/1958 23/06/1958 21 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 18/09/1958 04/11/1958 48 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7622 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2763 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
629172
Swindon Works 18/11/1958 05/12/1958 18 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 30/05/1960 10/08/1960 73 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7637 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4120 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
706642
Swindon Works 15/08/1962 12/10/1962 59 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7604 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2436 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
807660

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/06/1946 To Service To service as GWR Number 7005, name: LAMPHEY CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Worcester (WOS)
Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g
Diagram HC boiler fitted
   
25/08/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2569    
01/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 01/09/1948. Dep: 08/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7622 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2720 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/04/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2907    
29/01/1950 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4048    
14/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/03/1950. Dep: 26/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4053 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
16/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/11/1950. Dep: 20/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4006 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
12/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 12/06/1951. Dep: 26/07/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6696 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2563 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/11/1951 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2862    
08/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/05/1953. Dep: 23/06/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7619 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2730 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/02/1954. Dep: 10/12/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4108 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
01/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 01/03/1955. Dep: 07/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7616 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4012 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/12/1956. Dep: 12/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6698 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2892 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/1957 Report Report: It is reported that in honour of the composer’s centenary this year "Castle" No. 7005—appropriately, a Worcester engine—is to be renamed Sir Edward Elgar. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957)    
08/1957 Naming Renamed 'SIR EDWARD ELGAR'    
03/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1958. Dep: 23/06/1958.    
18/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 18/09/1958. Dep: 04/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7622 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2763 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/11/1958. Dep: 05/12/1958.    
30/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 30/05/1960. Dep: 10/08/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7637 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4120 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
15/08/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/08/1962. Dep: 12/10/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7604 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2436 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/03/1963 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2737    
08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 7005 from Southall (81C)    
01/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev