08/04/1962 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
New Erecting Shop: D52 (Complete), D1037-9 (Body shells), D231/94/5, D8015, E3020. New Erecting Shop Yard: D303, 42640. Erecting Shop: D53-5 (Engines in), D56/7, D1035/6 (Body Sides only), D7, D212/3/5/7/26/92, D325, D8005, 41225/39/41, 42102/5/33/5, 42249/96, 42555/6, 42644/86, 44741, 44815, 44911, 45134, 45202/10/24/31/62, 45375, 45557/71/90/1/9, 45632/3/54, 45742, 46111/22/9, 46238, 48452, 48504, 70015/20/51, 92045, 92120. Erecting Shop Yard: D335, D8019, 42586, 45097, 45370, 45434, 46132/45/56, 46222/39/42, 78013. Paint Shop: D50/1/64-7, 45242, 46240, 49395, 90606 and an unidentified electric loco. Paint Shop Yard: D235, 90178. Works Yard: 42256, 42494, 42514, 44778, 44862, 44932/64, 45535, 45671, 46118/48, 48600, 70014, 90167, 90201, 90520, 92022/46/54. Scrap Road: 40024, 40132, 41900, 46204/11/2, 49134 complete with 40180, 45519, 51222 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 43957, 44363/73, 47592, 47618/61, 51412, 52093, 52312, 52441, D3245. |
SLS/196205 |
12/08/1964 |
Crewe Works (Works Yard) |
Arrival Sidings: 41264, 42233/581/651, 44836/8/934, 45005/38/249, 46487, 48050/205/301/556/617, 78023, 84028. Paint Shop: D1589, D1611/2/3/5/6, 26057, 27006, L.M.S. 6233 Duchess of Sutherland (painted in L.M.S. livery for Butlin's Camp, Ayrshire), 49395, Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D230/41/82, D302/22, D1610, D6826/36, 48641. Paint Shop Yard: 42210/152, 48158/62/462, 78010, 92203. Diesel Test Road: D207, D1614, D8053. Erecting Shop: New Construction D1619-D1636 in various stages of construction, D203/74/6/9/83, D304/6/29/33/84/6, D5719, D6843, D8009/13/17/55, 42134/577/611, 44695/946, 45003/338, 45558, 48104/36/215/18/87/305/531/710/67, 92001/59/166/77, 92205/12. No. 9 Shop: D1617/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 48010/193/466, 84026, 92042. Works Yard: D217/8/89/91, D350, D5706/16, D6758, D8045, 42115/697, 44593/937, 45297/325, 48002/153/267/426/548/53/676, 70001/9/36/51, 78044. Electric Traction Shop: E3021, 26033/52, D288, D315/24. Scrap Road: 48069/155/203/310/657/745, 84021/2. Dismantling Shed: 42090/614/86, 48335/64/494/540, 84025, 92065. |
SLS/196409 |
27/06/1965 |
Crewe South MPD (Waiting works) |
Waiting works: 44683, 45102, 48001, 70014/51, 78025. ex-Works: 44852/929, 48095/410, 70012, 92024/91. |
SLS/196508 |
16/01/1966 |
Crewe Works (Paint shop) |
Erecting shop: 44834/856, 45073/212/87/318. 45593 (repaint), 48340/723, 70005/11/40/5, 92013/32/71/90, D238, D249, D275, D296, D315/31/2/78/81, D1508/31/47/9/98, D1692, D1710, D8012 and D1991-1999, D1100; Electric shop: E3014/41/9/67, E26020/43, E27001; 'new' shop: D1533, D1617/36/81, D1754, D1803, D1970. Traverser area: D214, D243/92, D399, D5706/15/6, D8005, D1500/3/41/6/80, D160/83/94. 01700/51/64, D1840; Test area: D243/4, D1527/35/61/82. Old Cutting-up shop: D1515/73, D1788, D8016, E3045, D257. Waiting Works: 45350, 48683, 92020/208. Paint shop: 46235 (inside), D245, D252, D380, D1579, D1985-1990, D5709, 44871, 70051, 92107, 71000 (stored). |
SLS/196602 |
24/07/1966 |
Crewe Works (Side of works) |
Erecting Shop: 45041/187/203/54/312, 48076/151/356/465/622, 75029, 92069/154, D223/35/56/87/91, D360, D1563/4/89/94, D1612/82/90, D1724/51/9/72, D5717, D8026/49, D1102-9. Electric shop: E3033/8/42/3/89, 26037; Adjoining Electric shop: D1500/14/8/687/715/60/813/58/88, D244, D297, D5252/7, D7584/5, 27000. Paint shop area: D200, D277, D342, D1101, D1716, D1841, D5709. Traverser area: 26009, 27005, D333, D1510/78/632/50/70/743/8/851/79/906/9, D5714, E3011/44/86. Test area: D397, D1542/59/82/95/710/7, D5275. Old C shop: E3016/45/67/173, D5102/3, D5704. Side of works: D386, D1581, D1853, D5710, 44779, 60007 for restoration, 70051, 71000, 75062. |
SLS/196609 |