|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 24/04/1950 | 31/05/1950 | 38 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7602 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4009 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
87089 | |
Swindon Works | 09/10/1951 | 14/11/1951 | 37 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7622 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2667 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
165391 | |
Swindon Works | 10/04/1954 | 25/05/1954 | 46 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 4030 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
263579 | |
Swindon Works | 27/04/1955 | 28/06/1955 | 63 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2921 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 28/01/1956 | 19/03/1956 | 52 days | Heavy General | Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
346611 | |
Swindon Works | 18/11/1957 | 07/01/1958 | 51 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7602 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4072 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
436436 | |
Swindon Works | 14/04/1959 | 03/06/1959 | 51 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7609 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2918 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
507424 | |
Swindon Works | 27/04/1961 | 27/06/1961 | 62 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7642 (Diagram HC) |
589945 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. 1903, 2031, 2808/89, 2924/36/37/54, 3827, 4021/22/32/51/80/89/91/96, 4386, 4938/40/92, 5010/21/23, 5158, 5258, 5317/36/74, 5526/48/59/65, 5914/68, 6001/11/25/29, 6369/89, 6426, 6807/71, 6900/06/27/29, 7007, 7301/15, 77028, 77429 an 78714. New work (May): Nos. 7008 OXF, 7009 LDR (the latter is fitted with smokebox number plate); D.E. 15103/04 PDN; 9667-70. No. 7010 is nearly ready (28/5) and is painted pea green, as also is No. 4089, which is undergoing a general repair. Nos. 6009/26 have been painted royal blue and lined out in grey, yellow and red. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 1713, 2730/49/81, 3561 and D.E. 15103/04. Locomotives condemned include: Nos. 3391, 2980 an 2988. | SLS/194807 |
30/06/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos 1003, 1338, 1436/49, 1782, 2135, 2816/18/29/57/85/95, 2920/40, 3802, 4031/34/83, 4805, 4908/16/52/99. 5013/16/17/26/43/51/54/72/83, 5341/53/71/79, 5411, 5908/54/72/87/99, 6007/16, 6300/01/05/16, 6400, W.D. 77325, 77407, 79266. New work (June): Nos. 7010 OXF, 7012 NYA, 7013 PDN are all painted pea green and lined out in red, cream and grey, while No. 7014 is being painted G.W. green-they are all fitted with smokebox number plates. No. 6910 has been painted black and lined out in red, cream and grey -a smokebox number plate has been fitted, while No. 7007 has had the G.W. coat of arms transfer placed on each middle splasher. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 and D.E. 15105 PDN. Nos. 1196 an 1197 were noted cut-up in the concentration yard, early in the month. Locomotives painted in the new livery, apart from new construction include: Nos. 4091, 5010/21 (green) and No. 6025 (blue); it is under-stood that No. 6001 has also been painted blue. All locomotives in the new livery have smokebox number plates, the actual figures being in brass. No. 7009, although in G.W.R. livery, has a smokebox number plate, as has No. 6022. | SLS/194808 |
28/05/1961 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | Gas Works: 4203, 5103/10/76, 9414. Stock Shed Yard: D817, D6319/21, 5815. Triangle: 1361/2/4, 1433, 1647, 3657/67/70/7, 3724, 5001, 6027, 6959, 8457, 8705, 9762. Works Yard: D804/38, D2144/88/91/6, D7000, 1029, 1501/2/9, 1604, 2516, 2884, 4090, 4950/72/8/85, 5022/97, 5949/58, 6004, 6937/62, 7007, 7221, 7304/40, 7761/75, 9400, 9749, 82031, 92226/45. Weigh House: D808, 4984. 'A' Shop: D602, D801/15/8/36/40/3/50/69/70, D1000-7, D2195/7-9, D2372-4, D3257, D6305/9, 3817, 4088, 4264/75, 4704, 4912/4/42/70/88/94, 5015/51/70/2/99, 5914/48/51/3/70/87, 6020, 6333/72, 6828/44/50, 6911/69/77/9, 7002/9/32/6, 7232/3, 13187, 13256/62, 15100/2, 82020/1, 92234. Dump: 1366, 1419/31/54/73, 2207/27, 3676, 5158/75/94, 5771/91, 6426, 7748, 8429, 8722/6/40/69/77, 9735/81. 'C' Shop: 5207, 8101. Field: 78001/8. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/05/1948 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 7009, name: ATHELNEY CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Landore (LDR) Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g Diagram HC boiler fitted |
||
24/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 24/04/1950. Dep: 31/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7602 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4009 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/06/1951 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2694 | ||
09/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 09/10/1951. Dep: 14/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7622 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2667 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/11/1953 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2593 | ||
10/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/04/1954. Dep: 25/05/1954. Work undertaken: Tender number 4030 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/04/1955. Dep: 28/06/1955. Work undertaken: Tender number 2921 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/01/1956. Dep: 19/03/1956. Work undertaken: Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/11/1957. Dep: 07/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7602 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4072 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/06/1958 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2929 | ||
14/06/1958 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2403 | ||
14/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/04/1959. Dep: 03/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7609 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2918 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/04/1961. Dep: 27/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7642 (Diagram HC) |
||
27/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) | ||
05/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
24/02/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
03/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) | ||
17/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
22/03/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7009 from Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
13/07/1963 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2744 | ||
08/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Coopers Metals: Sharpness |