Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 429 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18232 Week
» 71248 Month
» 190775 Year
» 3217628 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7010 |
20/11/1961 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over green with light green skirting, white window surrounds |
20/11/1961 |
BSYP |
BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
by 05/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/11/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/11/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7010 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7904 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
21/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
01/01/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7010 from Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
11/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|