Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 826 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3386 Week
» 16419 Month
» 238820 Year
» 1123201 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7010 m/e 07/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1948 AVONDALE CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 07/1948 to Oxford (OXF)
Withdrawal Tue 10/03/1964 off Reading (W.R.) (81D)
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Hayes (Bridgend)
Service Life 15 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Hawksworth 4,000g 4053 09/06/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2659 28/04/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2749 02/12/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2421 06/04/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2636 09/10/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2722 21/12/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2897 10/09/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4070 08/05/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2922 03/11/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2574 19/09/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2535 09/08/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2622 18/01/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2683 03/07/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2859 29/11/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2412 04/09/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
OXF Oxford (New) m/e 07/1948
81A Old Oak Common m/e 10/1952
81D Reading (W.R.) 27/01/1964
   Withdrawn 10/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW PDN Old Oak Common m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC OXF Oxford 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 27/01/1964
WDN   10/03/1964
WDN   5w/e 30/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1948 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7602)
28/04/1950 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7607)
27/03/1952 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7605)
08/05/1956 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7629)
19/09/1957 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7600)
03/07/1959 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6696)
28/10/1960 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7696)
28/10/1960 Double Chimney fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 23/03/1950 28/04/1950 37 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7607 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2659 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
89532
Swindon Works 22/02/1952 27/03/1952 35 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7605 (Diagram HC)
153129
Swindon Works 10/02/1954 06/04/1954 56 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2421 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
252683
Swindon Works 15/11/1954 21/12/1954 37 days Light Casual
Tender number 2722 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 15/03/1956 08/05/1956 55 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7629 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4070 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
352627
Swindon Works 08/05/1957 19/09/1957 135 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7600 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2574 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
408436
Swindon Works 14/05/1959 03/07/1959 51 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6696 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2683 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
499767
Swindon Works 08/09/1960 28/10/1960 51 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7696 (Diagram HD)
Double Chimney fitted
566758
Swindon Works 01/06/1962 04/09/1962 96 days Light Intermediate
Tender number 2412 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/06/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4053    
07/1948 To Service To service as GWR Number 7010, name: AVONDALE CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Oxford (OXF)
Diagram HC boiler fitted
   
23/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 23/03/1950. Dep: 28/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7607 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2659 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 22/02/1952. Dep: 27/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7605 (Diagram HC)
   
10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
02/12/1953 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2749    
10/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/02/1954. Dep: 06/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2421 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
09/10/1954 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2636    
15/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1954. Dep: 21/12/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2722 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/09/1955 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2897    
15/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/03/1956. Dep: 08/05/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7629 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4070 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
03/11/1956 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2922    
08/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/05/1957. Dep: 19/09/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7600 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2574 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
09/08/1958 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2535    
18/01/1959 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2622    
14/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/05/1959. Dep: 03/07/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6696 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2683 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/09/1960. Dep: 28/10/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7696 (Diagram HD)
Double Chimney fitted
   
29/11/1960 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2859    
01/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 01/06/1962. Dep: 04/09/1962.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2412 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
10/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 7010 from Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Hayes: Bridgend    

prev prev