Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 305 Today
» 815 Yesterday
» 305 Week
» 16284 Month
» 211738 Year
» 1096119 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7011 m/e 07/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1948 BANBURY CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 07/1948 to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)
Withdrawal Sat 13/02/1965 off Oxley (2B)
Scrapping During 05/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 16 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Hawksworth 4,000g 4054 17/06/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2895 01/06/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4046 10/09/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4072 12/08/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2555 12/12/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2862 29/05/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2869 07/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4050 16/02/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2674 15/05/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4050 04/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2778 23/12/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4093 22/11/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BRD Bristol Bath Road (New) m/e 07/1948
84C Banbury 21/10/1959
86C Cardiff Canton 04/04/1960
85A Worcester 23/12/1960
81D Reading (W.R.) 22/11/1962
85A Worcester 27/01/1964
2B Oxley 20/06/1964
   Withdrawn 13/02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/06/1948
1STALLOC BRD Bristol Bath Road m/e 31/07/1948
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 08/08/1959
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 23/04/1960
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 28/01/1961
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 27/01/1964
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 2B Oxley 5w/e 11/07/1964
WDN   w/e 13/02/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1948 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7603)
01/06/1950 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6691)
10/09/1951 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6692)
29/05/1953 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6691)
16/02/1955 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6690)
15/05/1957 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6694)
22/11/1962 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7617)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 27/04/1950 01/06/1950 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6691 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2895 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
94634
Swindon Works 03/08/1951 10/09/1951 39 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6692 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4046 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
172614
Swindon Works 09/05/1952 28/05/1952 20 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 17/07/1952 12/08/1952 27 days Light Casual
Tender number 4072 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 21/04/1953 29/05/1953 39 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6691 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2862 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
261085
Swindon Works 12/01/1955 16/02/1955 36 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6690 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4050 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
357348
Swindon Works 12/01/1957 15/05/1957 124 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6694 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
442946
Swindon Works 05/09/1958 30/10/1958 56 days Heavy Intermediate 524259
Swindon Works 01/1959 28/01/1959   Unclassified  
Swindon Works 01/11/1960 23/12/1960 53 days Light Intermediate
Tender number 2778 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
618983
Swindon Works 24/03/1961 25/05/1961 63 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 05/10/1962 22/11/1962 49 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7617 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4093 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
718784

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/06/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4054    
07/1948 To Service To service as GWR Number 7011, name: BANBURY CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)
Diagram HC boiler fitted
   
27/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/04/1950. Dep: 01/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6691 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2895 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/08/1951. Dep: 10/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6692 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4046 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
09/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/05/1952. Dep: 28/05/1952.    
17/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/07/1952. Dep: 12/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4072 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
12/12/1952 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2555    
21/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/04/1953. Dep: 29/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6691 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2862 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/1953 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2869    
12/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/01/1955. Dep: 16/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6690 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4050 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
12/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 12/01/1957. Dep: 15/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6694 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/1958 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4050    
05/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/09/1958. Dep: 30/10/1958.    
01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/01/1959. Dep: 28/01/1959.    
21/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
04/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
01/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 01/11/1960. Dep: 23/12/1960.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2778 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
24/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/03/1961. Dep: 25/05/1961.    
05/10/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 05/10/1962. Dep: 22/11/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7617 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4093 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
22/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
27/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (2B)    
13/02/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 7011 from Oxley (2B)    
05/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev