Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 31 Online
» 43 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6258 Week
» 17963 Month
» 349452 Year
» 426039 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D7018 18/01/1962

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 35
Wheels B-B
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Works Number 7912
To Service 18/01/1962
Withdrawn 16/03/1975
Time in Service 13 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
82A Bristol Bath Road (New) 18/01/1962
86A Cardiff Canton 5w/e 20/02/1966
81A Old Oak Common 9w/e 08/01/1972
   Withdrawn 16/03/1975

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/01/1962 To Service To service as D7018
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7912
Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)
   
20/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
16/03/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as D7018    

prev prev