|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 09/03/1951 | 12/04/1951 | 35 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7617 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2389 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
99620 | |
Swindon Works | 15/12/1952 | 21/01/1953 | 38 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7649 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2774 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
206514 | |
Swindon Works | 23/01/1954 | 26/02/1954 | 35 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2841 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 08/09/1954 | 14/10/1954 | 37 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7654 (Diagram HD) Tender number 4103 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
296142 | |
Swindon Works | 19/06/1956 | 03/10/1956 | 107 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7669 (Diagram HD) Tender number 4066 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
381334 | |
Swindon Works | 14/11/1957 | 30/12/1957 | 47 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2620 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 25/06/1958 | 12/09/1958 | 80 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2897 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
478885 | |
Swindon Works | 30/10/1958 | 26/11/1958 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Swindon Works | 10/06/1960 | 19/08/1960 | 71 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7674 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2653 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
567485 | |
Swindon Works | 28/11/1962 | 25/01/1963 | 59 days | Light Intermediate | Tender number 2734 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
658850 | |
Swindon Works | 17/03/1964 | 08/05/1964 | 53 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work May: Nos. 7018 Drysllwyn Castle (originally intended to have been named Cranbrook Castle) LDR (24/5), 7019 Fowey Castle BRD (27/5), *7020 Gloucester Castle (31/5); *9682 (6/5). *Not allocated. Nos. 7018-20 are painted dark green and lined. Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle and 7022 were nearly complete on 2/6; while on the same day No. 1500 had the motion, wheels, boiler and cab erected, No. 1501 cylinders, etc., erected, No. 1502 frames only and Nos. 7023/24 frames and cylinders only. Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. p23 (Petrol), 100A1, 1017, 1419/43, 2061 (closed cab), 2212/14/61/91, 2568, 2800/03/24/76/78/90, 3010/32, 3102/64/74, 3815/24/35, 4052/58/73/82, 4224, 4377, 4516/28/39, 4676, 4805/11/55/57 (for re-conversion to coal-burning), 4903/13/33/67/91/94, 5003/09/36/43/46/60/66/93/98, 5142, 5325/62, 5406, 5503/07/43/51, 5755/75/77, 5925/34/75/82, 6000/10/11/14, 6162/63 (both fitted with deconcentrating gear), 6346/57/62/73, 6710/16/24/31, 6823/40/61/68/73, 6931/36/43, 7222, 7321, 7704/90/94, 7806/07, 8701/41, 9613, 9700/10, 70836, 90357, 1299. Condemned: Nos. 277, 2756/89 (all acting as Works pilots), 30, 280 (still retains original boiler and has round topped tanks), 3400/43, 3577 (open cab), 5117. Nos. 6105/30 have had the footsteps set further inwards. No. E1299 failed here with a hot box on 11/5, after having worked the Grimsby fish train. Nos. 2863 (ex 4805) and 2853 (ex 4810) have been re-converted to coal-burning. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1015, 4949/86 an 5973. Nos. 1015, 5074 and 6936 have received tenders with the new crest. Lining: Commencing with No. 5069 (ex Works 12/5), all locomotives painted dark green or black and fully lined are having the cylinders lined out with two red I' vertical bands at both ends. In addition No. 5069 also had the cleating bands lined, but subsequent locomotives (including No. 7018) have not had this done. | SLS/194907 |
30/12/1962 | Western Regionboundary changes | The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. | SLS/196303 |
26/04/1964 | Swindon Works (A Shop) | Works Yard: D3508, D3811, 1024, 1447, 1666, 2818, 3721, 4652, 4923, 6106, 6147, 6871, 6915, 6952, 7812, 8102, 8732, 8738, 9425, 9431, 9484, 9486, 9743, 9752, 42961, 42978, 42983, 43001, 43115, 43132, 73003, 73021. A Shop: D812, D831, D846, D1004, D1005, D1013, D1027, D1035, D1041, D848, D1043, D1058, D1065, D1067, D3421, D3808, D3816, D3823, D3828, D3831, D7026, D7029, D7064, D7071, D7080, D9500, D9501, D9502, D9503, D9504, D9505, D9506, D9057 motors mounted, D9508, D9509, D9510, D9511 frames only, 4144, 7019, 7915, 8486, 42954, 42958, 43002, 43044, 43056, 43075, 43090, 43109, 73053, 73066, 76077, 76081, 92225. C Shop: 6025. Dump: 1650, 4706, 5057, 6010, 6603, 6680, 6824, 9420, 9603, 47623. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/05/1949 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 7019, name: FOWEY CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g Diagram HC boiler fitted |
||
09/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/03/1951. Dep: 12/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7617 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2389 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
30/10/1951 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4119 | ||
15/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/12/1952. Dep: 21/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7649 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2774 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/08/1953 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2425 | ||
23/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/01/1954. Dep: 26/02/1954. Work undertaken: Tender number 2841 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/09/1954. Dep: 14/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7654 (Diagram HD) Tender number 4103 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
19/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 19/06/1956. Dep: 03/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7669 (Diagram HD) Tender number 4066 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/11/1957. Dep: 30/12/1957. Work undertaken: Tender number 2620 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/06/1958. Dep: 12/09/1958. Work undertaken: Tender number 2897 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
30/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/10/1958. Dep: 26/11/1958. | ||
10/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 10/06/1960. Dep: 19/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7674 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2653 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
09/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) | ||
28/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/11/1962. Dep: 25/01/1963. Work undertaken: Tender number 2734 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
09/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxley (2B) | ||
17/03/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/03/1964. Dep: 08/05/1964. | ||
13/02/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7019 from Oxley (2B) | ||
04/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |