Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 26 Today
» 1145 Yesterday
» 6072 Week
» 25717 Month
» 60359 Year
» 1281924 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7020 m/e 06/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1949 GLOUCESTER CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 06/1949 to Cardiff Canton (CDF)
Withdrawal During 09/1964 off Southall (81C)
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Hayes (Bridgend)
Service Life 15 yrs , 3 mths

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Hawksworth 4,000g 4062 31/05/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2650 05/06/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4031 10/12/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2617 19/08/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4074 04/08/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2704 08/11/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2819 09/08/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2758 18/12/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2822 03/02/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4116 28/02/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CDF Cardiff Canton (New) m/e 06/1949
82C Swindon 08/11/1956
81A Old Oak Common 21/12/1956
   Stored (Old Oak Common) 13/02/1962
81A Old Oak Common (Reinstated) 28/12/1963
81C Southall 13/04/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   31/05/1949
NEW NYA   m/e 31/05/1949
1STALLOC CDF Cardiff Canton m/e 30/06/1949
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 31/12/1963
ALLOC 81C Southall 3w/e 29/06/1964
WDN   07/09/1964
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1949 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7616)
05/06/1951 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6697)
10/12/1952 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7642)
19/08/1954 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7626)
18/12/1954 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6667)
03/02/1961 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7678)
03/02/1961 Double Chimney fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 06/05/1951 05/06/1951 31 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6697 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2650 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
99319
Swindon Works 27/10/1952 10/12/1952 45 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7642 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4031 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
188483
Swindon Works 13/07/1954 19/08/1954 38 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7626 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2617 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
275302
Swindon Works 24/06/1955 04/08/1955 42 days Light Casual
Tender number 4074 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 26/03/1956 08/11/1956 228 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2704 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
360658
Swindon Works 11/12/1956 21/12/1956 11 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 25/10/1958 18/12/1958 55 days Heavy General
Tender number 2758 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 24/11/1960 03/02/1961 72 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7678 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2822 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
570421
Swindon Works 16/02/1961 28/02/1961 13 days Unclassified
Tender number 4116 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 31/05/1961 31/08/1961 93 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/05/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4062    
06/1949 To Service To service as GWR Number 7020, name: GLOUCESTER CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)
Diagram HC boiler fitted
   
06/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 06/05/1951. Dep: 05/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6697 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2650 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/10/1952. Dep: 10/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7642 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4031 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
13/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 13/07/1954. Dep: 19/08/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7626 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2617 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/12/1954 Modification Diagram HB number 6667 boiler fitted    
24/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/06/1955. Dep: 04/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4074 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
26/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/03/1956. Dep: 08/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2704 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
11/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/12/1956. Dep: 21/12/1956.    
21/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
09/08/1958 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2819    
25/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 25/10/1958. Dep: 18/12/1958.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2758 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 24/11/1960. Dep: 03/02/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7678 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2822 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
   
16/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1961. Dep: 28/02/1961.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4116 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
31/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/05/1961. Dep: 31/08/1961.    
13/02/1962 To Store To Store at Old Oak Common (81A)    
28/12/1963 Reinstated Reinstated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 7020 from Southall (81C)    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Hayes: Bridgend    

prev prev