Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1074 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6672 Week
» 29178 Month
» 332368 Year
» 1553933 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 7021 on 08/06/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
08/06/1949 HAVERFORDWEST CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 367
To Service Tue 08/06/1949 to Landore (LDR)
Withdrawal Tue 17/09/1963 off Llanelly (87F)
Scrapping During 05/1964 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 14 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Hawksworth 4,000g 4063 08/06/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4125 24/01/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4120 01/09/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2583 06/08/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4046 26/12/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4100 23/08/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2820 25/02/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2788 01/05/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2591 30/01/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2737 18/12/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2801 22/04/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2846 23/11/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2929 03/1963 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LDR Landore (New) on 08/06/1949
87G Carmarthen m/e 06/1950
87E Landore m/e 02/1951
87G Carmarthen m/e 11/1957
87E Landore on 18/06/1959
87F Llanelly on 13/06/1961
   Withdrawn on 17/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW LDR Landore m/e 30/06/1949
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 12/08/1950
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen w/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 87E Landore m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 17/06/1961
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 30/12/1961
WDN   on 17/09/1963
WDN   4w/e 29/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/06/1949 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7613)
24/01/1951 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7600)
01/09/1952 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7639)
23/08/1954 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7637)
18/12/1959 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7614)
23/11/1961 Double Chimney fitted
23/11/1961 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 9613)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 19/12/1950 24/01/1951 37 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7600 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4125 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
100563
Swindon Works 21/07/1952 01/09/1952 43 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7639 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4120 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
179299
Swindon Works 29/06/1953 06/08/1953 39 days Light Casual
Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 15/07/1954 23/08/1954 40 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7637 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4100 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
257566
Swindon Works 11/02/1956 04/04/1956 54 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2820 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 10/04/1956 01/05/1956 22 days Light Casual
Tender number 2788 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 28/12/1957 30/01/1958 34 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 02/11/1959 18/12/1959 47 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7614 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2737 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
520451
Swindon Works 28/09/1961 23/11/1961 57 days Heavy General
Boiler number 9613 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2846 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
611295

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1949 Swindon Works New Work May: Nos. 7018 Drysllwyn Castle (originally intended to have been named Cranbrook Castle) LDR (24/5), 7019 Fowey Castle BRD (27/5), *7020 Gloucester Castle (31/5); *9682 (6/5). *Not allocated. Nos. 7018-20 are painted dark green and lined. Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle and 7022 were nearly complete on 2/6; while on the same day No. 1500 had the motion, wheels, boiler and cab erected, No. 1501 cylinders, etc., erected, No. 1502 frames only and Nos. 7023/24 frames and cylinders only. Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. p23 (Petrol), 100A1, 1017, 1419/43, 2061 (closed cab), 2212/14/61/91, 2568, 2800/03/24/76/78/90, 3010/32, 3102/64/74, 3815/24/35, 4052/58/73/82, 4224, 4377, 4516/28/39, 4676, 4805/11/55/57 (for re-conversion to coal-burning), 4903/13/33/67/91/94, 5003/09/36/43/46/60/66/93/98, 5142, 5325/62, 5406, 5503/07/43/51, 5755/75/77, 5925/34/75/82, 6000/10/11/14, 6162/63 (both fitted with deconcentrating gear), 6346/57/62/73, 6710/16/24/31, 6823/40/61/68/73, 6931/36/43, 7222, 7321, 7704/90/94, 7806/07, 8701/41, 9613, 9700/10, 70836, 90357, 1299. Condemned: Nos. 277, 2756/89 (all acting as Works pilots), 30, 280 (still retains original boiler and has round topped tanks), 3400/43, 3577 (open cab), 5117. Nos. 6105/30 have had the footsteps set further inwards. No. E1299 failed here with a hot box on 11/5, after having worked the Grimsby fish train. Nos. 2863 (ex 4805) and 2853 (ex 4810) have been re-converted to coal-burning. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1015, 4949/86 an 5973. Nos. 1015, 5074 and 6936 have received tenders with the new crest. Lining: Commencing with No. 5069 (ex Works 12/5), all locomotives painted dark green or black and fully lined are having the cylinders lined out with two red I' vertical bands at both ends. In addition No. 5069 also had the cleating bands lined, but subsequent locomotives (including No. 7018) have not had this done. SLS/194907
30/06/1949 Swindon Works New Work June: Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle LDR (7/6), 7022 Hereford Castle CDF (14/6), 7023 Penrice Castle CDF (23/6), *7024 Powis Castle (30/6); *1500 (22/6), 41501 (1/7). *Not allocated. Nos. 7021-24 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1500/1 are unlined black. No. 1500 has so far been tried on a variety of jobs, and it is possible that they all may go to Cardiff Docks. Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos. 1001/29, 1335/63, 1458, 2216, 2534/72, 2823/81/82/84/92, 2945, 3031/34, 3161/67, 3649, 3851, 4016/37/40/83/84, 4259, 4381, 4504/13/93, 4651, 4807/54/56 (for reconversion to coal-burning), 4961, 5008/28/52/53/82, 5151, 5303/32/61, 5510/57/58, 5760/80/92, 5800, 5910/35/40/66, 6007/20, 6105/08, 6314/35/44/70/79, 6409, 6739, 6814/21/26/63/70, 6904/20/68, 7016, 7239, 7700/10/24/28/35, 7803, 7900, 8762/98 and E1066. Condemned: 53, 1731, 2651/55, 3364, 9072. No. 7900 came in for rebalancing, while No. E1066 had a hot box. No. 2848 has been reconverted to coal-burning. No. 6000 was ex Works on 17/6 painted in the new blue and lined, with crest on the tender, while No. 6011 has also appeared in the same livery, but, as yet, has no crest on the tender. Nos. 4052/58 are ex Works painted green and lined, while further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1017/29, 6931/43 an 6936 (with the crest on the tender). Stock Shed: Nos. 4914, 5919, 6997-99 and 7902-04 have now been taken out of store and put into traffic, Nos. 4914, 6997/99 and 7902 have gone to BRD, No. 6998 to CDF and Nos. 7903/04 to PDN. SLS/194908
12/11/1961 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) 'A' Shop: D603, D825/32/56, D1000-12, D2175-7, D2383/4, D3032, D6320, 1010/15/24, 2832, 4003/82/92/5, 4706, 4903/18/32/76/89, 5073/8/87/96/8, 5974/6, 6014/26/8, 6345, 6826/45, 6909/33/55/81, 7015/21/2/34, 7232, 7322 (being cut up), 7805, 7915, 9400, 13115, 13353/5/62, 15100, 73027, 82004/35, 92233/41/5. Works Sidings: L90, 8, 1006/23, 2215, 3838/9, 4075/83, 4207, 4945, 5071, 5950/98, 6019, 6309/29/38, 6820, 6915/64, 7002, 7901/17, 8787, 9705, 75005, 78008, 92212. Triangle: 1606/15, 4563/5, 5039, 5538, 6415, 6993, 7417, 7787, 8772, 9739. Dump: 1433, 5332, 6700, 8706, 9745/9. 'C' Shop: 6392, 7775 intact. Outside Stock Shed: 5815, 6357, 6900. Weigh House: 5938/55. Outside Weigh House: D831/53, D6303, D7010. Works Shunters: 5756/80, 7756, 8721/62. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/06/1949 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 7021, name: HAVERFORDWEST CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Landore (LDR)
Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g
Diagram HC boiler fitted
   
06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
19/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/12/1950. Dep: 24/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7600 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4125 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
21/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/07/1952. Dep: 01/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7639 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4120 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
29/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/06/1953. Dep: 06/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
26/12/1953 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4046    
15/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/07/1954. Dep: 23/08/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7637 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4100 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
11/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/02/1956. Dep: 04/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2820 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/04/1956. Dep: 01/05/1956.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2788 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
28/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/12/1957. Dep: 30/01/1958.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
02/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 02/11/1959. Dep: 18/12/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7614 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2737 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/04/1961 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2801    
13/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
28/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/09/1961. Dep: 23/11/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9613 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2846 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
   
03/1963 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2929    
17/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 7021 from Llanelly (87F)    

prev prev