Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3933 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17339 Week
» 70355 Month
» 189882 Year
» 3216735 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7024 |
16/03/1962 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and light green skirting, white window surrounds |
16/03/1962 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/03/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/03/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7024 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7918 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
01/01/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7024 from Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
11/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|