Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 598 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6203 Week
» 17750 Month
» 417432 Year
» 494019 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7027   02/09/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
02/09/1949 THORNBURY CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 02/09/1949
Withdrawal Sat 28/12/1963 off Reading (W.R.) (81D)
Service Life 14 yrs, 3 mths , 26 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Hawksworth 4,000g 4069 26/08/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4008 17/10/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4062 19/03/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2572 27/03/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4051 18/05/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4068 11/11/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2900 13/09/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2631 29/01/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2396 24/11/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2739 25/04/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2719 13/03/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2731 28/05/1963 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2627 13/07/1963 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Stored (at Swindon - stored from new) 02/09/1949
LA Laira 11/1949
82C Swindon 17/10/1951
81A Old Oak Common 09/11/1951
85A Worcester 25/04/1960
81D Reading (W.R.) 31/08/1963
   Withdrawn 28/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW LA Laira 25/08/1949
1STALLOC LA Laira m/e 30/09/1949
ALLOC LA Laira 4w/e 08/10/1949
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 21/05/1960
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 5w/e 31/08/1963
WDN   28/12/1963
WDN   4w/e 31/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/09/1949 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7621)
19/03/1953 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7618)
29/01/1957 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7605)
25/04/1960 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7615)

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 29/08/1951 17/10/1951 50 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 4008 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
109806
Swindon Works 30/01/1953 19/03/1953 49 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7618 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4062 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
184017
Swindon Works 17/04/1953 05/05/1953 19 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 02/04/1954 18/05/1954 47 days Light Casual
Tender number 4051 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 06/09/1954 11/11/1954 67 days Light Casual
Tender number 4068 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 04/08/1955 13/09/1955 41 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2900 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
291343
Swindon Works 03/11/1956 29/01/1957 88 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7605 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2631 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
364631
Swindon Works 03/10/1958 24/11/1958 53 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2396 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
458490
Swindon Works 16/02/1960 25/04/1960 70 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7615 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2739 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
531390
Swindon Works 18/12/1961 13/03/1962 86 days Light Intermediate
Tender number 2719 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
633938

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/08/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4069    
02/09/1949 To Service To service as GWR Number 7027, name: THORNBURY CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Diagram HC boiler fitted
   
02/09/1949 To Store To Store at Swindon (SDN) (stored from new)    
11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
29/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/08/1951. Dep: 17/10/1951.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4008 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
17/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
09/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
30/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 30/01/1953. Dep: 19/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7618 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4062 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
17/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1953. Dep: 05/05/1953.    
27/03/1954 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2572    
02/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/04/1954. Dep: 18/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4051 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
06/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/09/1954. Dep: 11/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4068 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
04/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/08/1955. Dep: 13/09/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2900 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/05/1956 Sightings Paddington-Bristol express BackTrack Jan 2007  
03/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/11/1956. Dep: 29/01/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7605 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2631 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/10/1958. Dep: 24/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2396 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 16/02/1960. Dep: 25/04/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7615 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2739 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
25/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
18/12/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 18/12/1961. Dep: 13/03/1962.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2719 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/03/1962 Sightings Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.   Link
28/05/1963 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2731    
13/07/1963 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2627    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
28/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 7027 from Reading (W.R.) (81D)    

prev prev