Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 768 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6373 Week
» 17920 Month
» 417602 Year
» 494189 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7029   05/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/1950 CLUN CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 05/1950 to Newton Abbot (83A)
Withdrawal During 12/1965 off Gloucester Horton Road (85B)
Service Life 15 yrs , 7 mths

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Hawksworth 4,000g 4100 25/05/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 4016 12/05/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4036 24/03/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4090 17/01/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2423 19/04/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4066 07/10/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2787 23/11/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2934 02/07/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2621 12/12/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83A Newton Abbot (New) 05/1950
81A Old Oak Common 02/07/1962
85B Gloucester Horton Road 05/10/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/05/1950
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 17/06/1950
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 11/08/1962
REINS 81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 05/10/1964
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1950 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7626)
12/02/1952 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7604)
24/03/1954 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7610)
17/01/1956 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7660)
07/10/1959 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7664)
07/10/1959 Double Chimney fitted
02/07/1962 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7675)

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 31/03/1952 12/05/1952 43 days Heavy General
Tender number 4016 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 08/02/1954 24/03/1954 45 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7610 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4036 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
217373
Swindon Works 10/12/1955 17/01/1956 39 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7660 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4090 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
304305
Swindon Works 28/07/1959 07/10/1959 72 days General
Boiler number 7664 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4066 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
483094
Swindon Works 01/05/1962 02/07/1962 63 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7675 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2934 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
576399
Swindon Works 19/11/1962 12/12/1962 24 days Light Casual
Tender number 2621 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1950 To Service To service as GWR Number 7029, name: CLUN CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Newton Abbot (83A)
Diagram HC boiler fitted
   
25/05/1950 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4100    
12/02/1952 Modification Diagram HC number 7604 boiler fitted    
31/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 31/03/1952. Dep: 12/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4016 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/02/1954. Dep: 24/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7610 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4036 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
10/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 10/12/1955. Dep: 17/01/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7660 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4090 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
19/04/1958 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2423    
28/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1959. Dep: 07/10/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7664 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4066 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
   
23/11/1960 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2787    
01/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 01/05/1962. Dep: 02/07/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7675 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2934 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
19/11/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1962. Dep: 12/12/1962.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2621 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
27/11/1965 Sightings Farewell to Western Region steam, Paddington - Bristol, Gloucester and Swindon BackTrack Jan 2007  
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 7029 from Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
26/07/1969 Sightings Allerton shed: Open Day - Exhibited RO 9/1969 Link
26/07/1969 Sightings D1643 hauled steam locomotives 7029 'Clun Castle', 5428 'Eric Treacy' and 5593 'Kolhapur' away from Allerton depot at 18:45 RO 9/1969  

prev prev